U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00779-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LEE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 03, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 27, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 27, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.