U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-mj-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VAZQUEZ-SALAZAR et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [0 - Docket Text Only]
  • September 15, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • September 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [0 - Docket Text Only]
  • September 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • September 08, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 01, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 30, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.