U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00794-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HAMILTON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • September 23, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 22, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • August 31, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.