U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00063
  • Case Name: ROBINSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Return of Service (Attorney Discipline)]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Mail Returned]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order of Attorney Discipline]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary)]
  • January 11, 2022: [MISC (Notice of Disciplinary Action)]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Mail Returned]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary)]
  • September 01, 2021: [MISC (Notice of Disciplinary Action)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.