U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00173-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Booker
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2021: [Commitment to Another District]
  • September 09, 2021: [Revocation of Probation/Supervised Release - Initial Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Bond Revoked]
  • September 09, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Probation Request (PS 8-W) - SEALED]
  • September 07, 2021: [Pretrial Filing]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 03, 2021: [Bond]
  • September 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5c3 - formerly Rule 40]
  • September 03, 2021: [Arrest - Rule 5]
  • September 02, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2021: [Rule 5c3 Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.