U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00811-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COLLIER et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 20, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • September 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • September 03, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 03, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.