U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00778-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARNELL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 15, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 03, 2021: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.