U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-00071-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Hall
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2021: [Commitment to Another District]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5c3 - formerly Rule 40]
  • September 09, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 08, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 07, 2021: [Rule 5c3 Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.