U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00158-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Yednak
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to Indict]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 10, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 09, 2021: [Bond]
  • September 09, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 08, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • September 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 07, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.