U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00835-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LANDA-HERNANDEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Waiver of Detention]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • October 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 21, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 20, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • September 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • September 10, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 10, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.