U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00034
  • Case Name: Triad Piling Products, LLC v. Gould
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Case Stayed]
  • January 05, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • November 03, 2021: [Stay]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 13, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 20, 2021: [Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 15, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 15, 2021: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.