U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00870-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HARRIS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 13, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 11, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 06, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • September 30, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion]
  • September 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2021: [Motion (Other)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • September 20, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • September 15, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 15, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.