U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mc-00009
  • Case Name: EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. GO WIRELESS OF EVANSVILLE INC.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Deactivated - Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2022: [Show Cause Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • September 17, 2021: [Declaration]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Case - Initiating Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.