U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00874-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LANCASTER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • September 17, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 17, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.