U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00886-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WOOD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Bond Hearing/Pretrial Release]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 22, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • September 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 22, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.