U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00939-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHENOWETH
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 14, 2021: [0 - Docket Text Only]
  • October 12, 2021: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [0 - Docket Text Only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.