U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00777-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MONTGOMERY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 20, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 27, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Entry]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 22, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • October 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.