U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-00092-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Montes
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Commitment to Another District]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Defendant Severed from Codefendants]
  • November 19, 2021: [Hearing]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • October 19, 2021: [Rule 5c3 Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.