U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00974-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VIVERETTE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 16, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 11, 2022: [Bond Hearing/Pretrial Release]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • June 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal/Maintain Under Seal Document]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Seal a Document (Motion to Seal or Motion to Maintain Under Seal)]
  • May 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Reply in Support of Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 12, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 10, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 17, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • November 10, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 28, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • October 27, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • October 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 21, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.