U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00917-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RODRIGUEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 02, 2022: [Bond Hearing/Pretrial Release]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [SCHEDULING Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • July 22, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 13, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Request/Consent to MODIFY Conditions of Pretrial Release (Applicable party - doc)]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 18, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 20, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 10, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 18, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Entry]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal/Maintain Under Seal Document]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Request/Consent to MODIFY Conditions of Pretrial Release (Applicable party - doc)]
  • December 15, 2021: [Seal a Document (Motion to Seal or Motion to Maintain Under Seal)]
  • December 15, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 21, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.