U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice - Other]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 26, 2021: [Bond]
  • October 26, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • October 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 22, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 22, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • October 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • October 21, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • October 21, 2021: [Complaint - Sealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.