U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00976-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CLARKE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • July 28, 2022: [Scheduling of Initial Appearance]
  • July 28, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 22, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • November 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 09, 2021: [Motion (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • October 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 25, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.