U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00983-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VASQUEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 26, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.