U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00091-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Jones
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 01, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • October 29, 2021: [Detain]
  • October 28, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • October 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.