U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00081
  • Case Name: IN RE: BROWN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order of Attorney Discipline]
  • February 09, 2022: [Response]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 02, 2022: [Return of Service (Attorney Discipline)]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary)]
  • January 11, 2022: [MISC (Notice of Disciplinary Action)]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Return of Service (Attorney Discipline)]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order of Attorney Discipline]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [MISC (Notice of Disciplinary Action)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.