U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CROMHOUDT
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Motion (Other)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Waiver of Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • November 01, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • October 29, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 29, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.