U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GREEN et. al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Custody]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • November 23, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • November 19, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 05, 2021: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2021: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • November 02, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.