U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-01013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RHUDE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 24, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 13, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 15, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 11, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 18, 2021: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Submission]
  • November 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • November 09, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • November 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • November 04, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.