U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00082
  • Case Name: COMSTOCK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Return of Service (Attorney Discipline)]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order of Attorney Discipline]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Return of Service (Attorney Discipline)]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary)]
  • November 05, 2021: [MISC (Notice of Disciplinary Action)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.