U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00083
  • Case Name: IN RE: THIRTY-SEVEN THOUSAND, NINE HUNDRED AND TWENTY DOLLARS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 02, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 25, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 10, 2021: [MISC (Notice of Judge Assignment)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.