U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00109-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Harris
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • November 17, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • November 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Detain]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 10, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.