U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-01023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CLARK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Submission]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal/Maintain Under Seal Document]
  • January 11, 2022: [Seal a Document (Motion to Seal or Motion to Maintain Under Seal)]
  • January 10, 2022: [Motion (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Commitment to Another District]
  • November 15, 2021: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • November 15, 2021: [0 - Docket Text Only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.