U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-01046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MAGNESS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 19, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • November 19, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.