U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mc-00051
  • Case Name: In Re Disciplinary Action J. David Massey
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order from Indiana Supreme Court Imposing Attorney Discipline]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Mail Returned]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order Imposing Disciplinary Action]
  • December 02, 2021: [Mail Returned]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order from Indiana Supreme Court Imposing Attorney Discipline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.