U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00087
  • Case Name: MASSEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order of Attorney Discipline]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary)]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [MISC (Notice of Disciplinary Action)]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Mail Returned]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order of Attorney Discipline]
  • December 20, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary)]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [MISC (Notice of Disciplinary Action)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.