U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-01067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MARTINEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • December 07, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • December 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 01, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.