U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00048-2
  • Case Name: USA v. MILLER et aL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • December 13, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • December 06, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.