U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00089
  • Case Name: ONE HUNDRED, FORTY-NINE THOUSAND, TWENTY DOLLARS, UNITED STATES CURRENCY et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 28, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 23, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 19, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 29, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 27, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 23, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 07, 2021: [MISC (Notice of Judge Assignment)]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 07, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.