U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00084
  • Case Name: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF NOVARTIS PHARMA, AG et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Closed Dismissed]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Change of Attorney Information]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2022: [Declaration]
  • June 14, 2022: [Reply in Support of Motion]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • June 13, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • June 06, 2022: [Appendix]
  • June 06, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Declaration]
  • May 23, 2022: [Motion (Other)]
  • May 23, 2022: [Objection]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [Reply in Support of Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2022: [Motion (Other)]
  • April 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • April 22, 2022: [Discovery]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • March 03, 2022: [Appear pro hac vice]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • February 23, 2022: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • February 16, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • February 16, 2022: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • February 15, 2022: [Appear pro hac vice]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [SCHEDULING Order]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • December 20, 2021: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Parties First Extension of Time]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.