U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00946-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 22, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • December 21, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of IFCD Attorney Designation]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • December 20, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Waiver of Detention]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.