U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-01125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DENNEMANN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 21, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 21, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • January 11, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • December 21, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • December 16, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 16, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.