U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mc-00001
  • Case Name: THE GEILER COMPANY, v. INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Reply in Support of Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Reply in Support of Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 23, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [MARGINAL ENTRY]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response]
  • April 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Response Deadline]
  • March 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Reply Deadline]
  • March 03, 2022: [Case Management Plan Tendered by]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [SCHEDULING Order]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • January 13, 2022: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
  • January 04, 2022: [MISC (Notice of Judge Assignment)]
  • January 03, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • January 03, 2022: [Motion (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.