U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00003-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Stovall
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • January 19, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 19, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • January 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 07, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 05, 2022: [Rule 5c3 Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.