U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARTWRIGHT
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of IFCD Attorney Designation]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • January 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2022: [Empty Text]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 11, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 11, 2022: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.