U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00005
  • Case Name: IN RE: INDIANA STATE MEDICAL ASSOCIATION'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING DISCLOSURE OF RECORDS PROTECTED UNDER 42 U.S.C. 290dd-2
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal/Maintain Under Seal Document]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • February 24, 2022: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 22, 2022: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal/Maintain Under Seal Document]
  • February 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • February 18, 2022: [Seal a Document (Motion to Seal or Motion to Maintain Under Seal)]
  • February 18, 2022: [SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc)]
  • February 18, 2022: [Reply in Support of Motion]
  • February 17, 2022: [Witness List]
  • February 17, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • February 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • February 15, 2022: [Seal a Document (Motion to Seal or Motion to Maintain Under Seal)]
  • February 15, 2022: [SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc)]
  • February 15, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 08, 2022: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • January 21, 2022: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2022: [Reassignment Letter (Recusal/Related Case/Workload/Other)]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • January 11, 2022: [MISC (Notice of Judge Assignment)]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2022: [Deactivated - Disclosure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.