U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AUSTIN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • January 24, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • January 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 14, 2022: [Empty Text]
  • January 13, 2022: [Writ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 13, 2022: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.