U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 19, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 12, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 09, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 27, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 26, 2022: [0 - Docket Text Only]
  • January 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 20, 2022: [0 - Docket Text Only]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • January 18, 2022: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • January 14, 2022: [Complaint & Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.