U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROBINSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 17, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 02, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 13, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 14, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 11, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 07, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • February 07, 2022: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 01, 2022: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • January 27, 2022: [Empty Text]
  • January 14, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 14, 2022: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.