U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00006
  • Case Name: STMicroelectronics, Inc. v. PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 07, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Parties First Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Transfer Case]
  • January 27, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 21, 2022: [Reassignment Letter (Recusal/Related Case/Workload/Other)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 20, 2022: [MISC (Notice of Judge Assignment)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Compel]
  • January 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Case - Initiating Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.