U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCLEMORE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 15, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 12, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 24, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • January 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 20, 2022: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.